Massachusetts 2025-2026 Regular Session

Massachusetts Senate Bill S1884 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/27/2025

                            1 of 1
SENATE DOCKET, NO. 2208       FILED ON: 1/17/2025
SENATE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 1884
The Commonwealth of Massachusetts
_________________
PRESENTED BY:
Liz Miranda
_________________
To the Honorable Senate and House of Representatives of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts in General
Court assembled:
The undersigned legislators and/or citizens respectfully petition for the adoption of the accompanying bill:
An Act relative to teacher retirement election.
_______________
PETITION OF:
NAME:DISTRICT/ADDRESS :Liz MirandaSecond SuffolkSal N. DiDomenicoMiddlesex and SuffolkMichael F. RushNorfolk and Suffolk1/21/2025Joanne M. ComerfordHampshire, Franklin and Worcester1/27/2025Ryan C. FattmanWorcester and Hampden1/27/2025Susannah M. Whipps2nd Franklin1/27/2025Bradley H. Jones, Jr.20th Middlesex1/27/2025Peter J. DurantWorcester and Hampshire1/27/2025John F. KeenanNorfolk and Plymouth2/10/2025Vanna Howard17th Middlesex2/10/2025Michael D. BradySecond Plymouth and Norfolk2/10/2025Dylan A. FernandesPlymouth and Barnstable2/10/2025Jacob R. OliveiraHampden, Hampshire and Worcester2/10/2025James K. Hawkins2nd Bristol2/12/2025Brendan P. CrightonThird Essex2/26/2025Paul W. MarkBerkshire, Hampden, Franklin and 
Hampshire
2/26/2025Patrick M. O'ConnorFirst Plymouth and Norfolk2/26/2025 1 of 4
SENATE DOCKET, NO. 2208       FILED ON: 1/17/2025
SENATE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 1884
By Ms. Miranda, a petition (accompanied by bill, Senate, No. 1884) of Liz Miranda, Sal N. 
DiDomenico, Michael F. Rush, Joanne M. Comerford and other members of the General Court 
for legislation relative to teacher retirement election. 	Public Service.
[SIMILAR MATTER FILED IN PREVIOUS SESSION
SEE SENATE, NO. 1702 OF 2023-2024.]
The Commonwealth of Massachusetts
_______________
In the One Hundred and Ninety-Fourth General Court
(2025-2026)
_______________
An Act relative to teacher retirement election.
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Court assembled, and by the authority 
of the same, as follows:
1 SECTION 1. The definition of “teacher” in section 1 of chapter 32 of the General Laws, 
2as appearing in the 2022 Official Edition, is hereby amended by adding the following sentence:- 
3Any person who served in a position described above who is vested in the teacher’s retirement 
4system or the Boston retirement system and is subsequently employed by the executive office of 
5education or the department of elementary and secondary education shall retain the status of 
6teacher and be considered as remaining in service in that capacity.
7 SECTION 2. Paragraph (a) of subdivision (8) 	of section 3 of said chapter 32, as so 
8appearing, is hereby amended by adding the following sentence:- A teacher who becomes 
9employed at the executive office of education or the department of elementary and secondary 
10education shall remain in the teacher’s retirement system or the Boston retirement system. 2 of 4
11 SECTION 3. Said subdivision (8) of said section 3 of said chapter 32, as so appearing, is 
12hereby further amended by adding the following 2 paragraphs:-
13 (e) An employee of the executive office of education or the department of elementary and 
14secondary education who is a member of the state employees’ retirement system and who is 
15reinstated in the teachers’ retirement system or the Boston retirement system pursuant to 
16paragraph (a) shall not be deemed to have had an interruption of membership or service. Upon 
17reinstatement, the member shall pay into the annuity savings fund of the teachers’ retirement 
18system or the Boston retirement system in 1 sum, or in installments as the board may prescribe, 
19makeup payments equal to the difference between the contributions paid to the state employees 
20retirement system and the required contributions of the teachers’ retirement system or the Boston 
21retirement system on all regular compensation received during the period of membership in the 
22state employees’ retirement system.
23 (f) Notwithstanding the provisions of this chapter or any other general or special law to 
24the contrary, a member who is reinstated in the teachers’ retirement system or the Boston 
25retirement system pursuant to paragraph (a) shall be entered into the state employees’ retirement 
26system as a group 1 state employee upon retirement.
27 SECTION 4. (a) Notwithstanding paragraph (i) of subdivision (4) of section 5 of chapter 
2832 of the General Laws, an active or inactive member of the teachers’ retirement system or the 
29Boston retirement system who: (i) is a teacher or school nurse; (ii) became eligible for 
30membership in the teachers’ retirement system before July 1, 2001; (iii) began contributing to the 
31teachers’ retirement system before July 1, 2001; and (iv) did not provide a written election to 
32participate in the alternative superannuation retirement benefit program provided under said  3 of 4
33subdivision (4) to the teachers’ retirement system or the Boston retirement system before July 1, 
342001 or at any other time prior to December 31, 2024 or declined to participate in the alternative 
35superannuation retirement benefit program before July 1, 2001 or at any other time prior to 
36December 31, 2024, shall have a new 1-time opportunity to elect to participate in the alternative 
37superannuation retirement benefit program. A member entitled to make an election under this 
38section shall have 180 days from the effective date of this act to make such election.
39 (b) A member who participates in the alternative superannuation retirement benefit 
40program under this section shall make contributions at the rate of 11 per cent pursuant to section 
4122 of chapter 32 of the General Laws and may be required to provide make-up contributions at 
42the rate of 11 per cent, upon such terms and conditions as the relevant retirement system may 
43require, from the date that such member established membership in the teachers’ retirement 
44system or the Boston retirement system.
45 (c) The teachers’ retirement system and the Boston retirement system shall notify eligible 
46active or inactive members of the teachers’ retirement system and the Boston retirement system 
47and shall provide information to school districts concerning the 1-time opportunity pursuant to 
48subsection (a); provided, that the teachers’ retirement system and the Boston retirement system 
49shall provide sufficient information pursuant to subsection (a) and (b) not later than 90 days after 
50the effective date of this act.
51 SECTION 5. Section 91 of said chapter 32, as so appearing, is hereby amended by 
52striking subsection (e) and inserting in place thereof the paragraph:
53 (e) Notwithstanding the provisions of paragraphs (a) to (d), inclusive, in any period 
54during which there is a critical shortage of certified teachers available for employment in a  4 of 4
55school district, said school district may employ as a teacher or as a mentor to other teachers any 
56person who has retired from the teachers' retirement system or the Boston retirement system. 
57Any such retired person who renders service in a public school district as a teacher or as a 
58mentor to other teachers shall be subject to all laws, rules and regulations governing the 
59employment of teachers in the school district. Such person shall not be deemed to have resumed 
60active membership in the teachers' retirement system or Boston retirement system and said 
61service shall not be counted as creditable service toward retirement.