Massachusetts 2025-2026 Regular Session

Massachusetts Senate Bill S238 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 1 of 1
22 SENATE DOCKET, NO. 2420 FILED ON: 1/17/2025
33 SENATE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 238
44 The Commonwealth of Massachusetts
55 _________________
66 PRESENTED BY:
77 Paul R. Feeney
88 _________________
99 To the Honorable Senate and House of Representatives of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts in General
1010 Court assembled:
1111 The undersigned legislators and/or citizens respectfully petition for the adoption of the accompanying bill:
1212 An Act extending live and simulcast horse racing in the Commonwealth.
1313 _______________
1414 PETITION OF:
1515 NAME:DISTRICT/ADDRESS :Paul R. FeeneyBristol and Norfolk 1 of 4
1616 SENATE DOCKET, NO. 2420 FILED ON: 1/17/2025
1717 SENATE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 238
1818 By Mr. Feeney, a petition (accompanied by bill, Senate, No. 238) of Paul R. Feeney for
1919 legislation to extend live and simulcast horse racing from one location to another venue,
2020 allowing people at different sites to watch and bet on the same race simultaneously. Consumer
2121 Protection and Professional Licensure.
2222 The Commonwealth of Massachusetts
2323 _______________
2424 In the One Hundred and Ninety-Fourth General Court
2525 (2025-2026)
2626 _______________
2727 An Act extending live and simulcast horse racing in the Commonwealth.
2828 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Court assembled, and by the authority
2929 of the same, as follows:
3030 1 SECTION 1. The first paragraph of section 12A of chapter 494 of the acts of 1978 is
3131 2hereby amended by striking out the words “and until December 15, 2025”, inserted by section 7
3232 3of chapter 26 of the acts of 2023, and inserting in place thereof the following words:- and until
3333 4December 15, 2026.
3434 5 SECTION 2. The last paragraph of said section 12A of said chapter 494 is hereby
3535 6amended by striking out the words “December 15, 2025”, inserted by section 8 of said chapter
3636 726, and inserting in place thereof the following words:- December 15, 2026. 
3737 8 SECTION 3. The introductory paragraph of section 13 of said chapter 494 is hereby
3838 9amended by striking out the words “and until December 15, 2025”, inserted by section 9 of said
3939 10chapter 26, and inserting in place thereof the following words:- and until December 15, 2026. 2 of 4
4040 11 SECTION 4. Section 15 of said chapter 494 is hereby amended by striking out the words
4141 12“and until December 15, 2025”, inserted by section 10 of said chapter 26, and inserting in place
4242 13thereof the following words:- and until December 15, 2026.
4343 14 SECTION 5. The first paragraph of section 9 of chapter 277 of the acts of 1986 is hereby
4444 15amended by striking out the words “and until December 15, 2025”, inserted by section 11 of said
4545 16chapter 26, and inserting in place thereof the following words:- and until December 15, 2026.
4646 17 SECTION 6. The first sentence of the first paragraph of section 3 of chapter 114 of the
4747 18acts of 1991 is hereby amended by striking out the words “and until December 15, 2025”,
4848 19inserted by section 12 of said chapter 26, and inserting in place thereof the following words:- and
4949 20until December 15, 2026.
5050 21 SECTION 7. The last paragraph of said section 3 of said chapter 114 is hereby amended
5151 22by striking out the words “December 15, 2025”, inserted by section 13 of said chapter 26, and
5252 23inserting in place thereof the following words:- December 15, 2026.
5353 24 SECTION 8. The first paragraph of section 4 of said chapter 114 is hereby amended by
5454 25striking out the words “and until December 15, 2025”, inserted by section 14 of said chapter 26,
5555 26and inserting in place thereof the following words:- and until December 15, 2026.
5656 27 SECTION 9. The last paragraph of said section 4 of said chapter 114 is hereby amended
5757 28by striking out the words “December 15, 2025”, inserted by section 15 of said chapter 26, and
5858 29inserting in place thereof the following words:- December 15, 2026. 3 of 4
5959 30 SECTION 10. The first paragraph of section 5 of said chapter 114 is hereby amended by
6060 31striking out the words “and until December 15, 2025”, inserted by section 16 of said chapter 26,
6161 32and inserting in place thereof the following words:- and until December 15, 2026.
6262 33 SECTION 11. Section 45 of chapter 139 of the acts of 2001 is hereby amended by
6363 34striking out the words “December 15, 2025”, inserted by section 17 of said chapter 26, and
6464 35inserting in place thereof the following words:- December 15, 2026.
6565 36 SECTION 12. Section 20 of chapter 449 of the acts of 2006 is hereby amended by
6666 37striking out the words “December 15, 2025”, inserted by section 18 of said chapter 26, and
6767 38inserting in place thereof the following words:- December 15, 2026.
6868 39 SECTION 13. Section 92 of chapter 194 of the acts of 2011 is hereby amended by
6969 40striking out the words “December 15, 2025”, inserted by section 19 of said chapter 26, and
7070 41inserting in place thereof the following words:- December 15, 2026.
7171 42 SECTION 14. Section 112 of said chapter 194 is hereby amended by striking out the
7272 43words “December 15, 2025”, inserted by section 20 of said chapter 26, and inserting in place
7373 44thereof the following words:- December 15, 2026.
7474 45 SECTION 15. Section 74 of chapter 10 of the acts of 2015 is hereby amended by striking
7575 46out the words “December 15, 2025”, inserted by section 21 of said chapter 26, and inserting in
7676 47place thereof the following words:- December 15, 2026.
7777 48 SECTION 16. Section 23 of chapter 26 of the acts of 2023 is hereby repealed.
7878 49 SECTION 17. Notwithstanding section 2 of chapter 128A of the General Laws, sections
7979 501, 2, 2A and 4 of chapter 128C of the General Laws and section 9 of said chapter 128C, as 4 of 4
8080 51inserted by section 6 of chapter 173 of the acts of 2022, or any other general or special law to the
8181 52contrary, the running race horse meeting licensee located in Suffolk county licensed to conduct
8282 53live racing pursuant to said chapter128A and simulcast wagering pursuant to said chapter 128C
8383 54in calendar year 2025 shall remain licensed as a running horse racing meeting licensee and shall
8484 55remain authorized to conduct simulcast wagering pursuant to said chapter 128C until December
8585 5615, 2026; provided, however, that the days between January 1, 2025 and December 31, 2026
8686 57shall be dark days pursuant to said chapter 128C and the licensee shall be precluded from
8787 58conducting live racing during that period unless it applies for and is granted a supplemental live
8888 59racing license pursuant to said chapter 128A; provided further, that the licensee shall not
8989 60simulcast or accept a wager on greyhound dog racing on or after August 10, 2023 pursuant to
9090 61section 9 of chapter 128C of the General Laws; provided further, that all simulcasts shall comply
9191 62with the Interstate Horse Racing Act of 1978, 15 U.S.C. 3001et seq. or other applicable federal
9292 63law; provided further, that all simulcasts from states which have racing associations that do not
9393 64require approval in compliance with the Interstate Horse Racing Act of 1978, 15 U.S.C.
9494 653004(a)(1)(A) shall require the approval of the New England Horsemen’s Benevolent &
9595 66Protective Association prior to being simulcast to a racing meeting licensee within the
9696 67commonwealth; and provided further, that if the association agrees to approve the simulcast for 1
9797 68racing meeting licensee, it shall approve the simulcast for all otherwise eligible racing meeting
9898 69licensees.