Massachusetts 2025-2026 Regular Session

Massachusetts Senate Bill S574 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 1 of 1
22 SENATE DOCKET, NO. 1864 FILED ON: 1/16/2025
33 SENATE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 574
44 The Commonwealth of Massachusetts
55 _________________
66 PRESENTED BY:
77 William J. Driscoll, Jr.
88 _________________
99 To the Honorable Senate and House of Representatives of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts in General
1010 Court assembled:
1111 The undersigned legislators and/or citizens respectfully petition for the adoption of the accompanying bill:
1212 An Act establishing memorial markers in the towns of Milton and Canton in memory of certain
1313 law enforcement officers killed in the line of duty.
1414 _______________
1515 PETITION OF:
1616 NAME:DISTRICT/ADDRESS :William J. Driscoll, Jr.Norfolk, Plymouth and Bristol 1 of 2
1717 SENATE DOCKET, NO. 1864 FILED ON: 1/16/2025
1818 SENATE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 574
1919 By Mr. Driscoll, a petition (accompanied by bill, Senate, No. 574) of William J. Driscoll, Jr. that
2020 the Department of Conservation and Recreation erect and maintain memorial markers in the
2121 towns of Milton and Canton in memory of certain law enforcement officers killed in the line of
2222 duty. Environment and Natural Resources.
2323 [SIMILAR MATTER FILED IN PREVIOUS SESSION
2424 SEE HOUSE, NO. 786 OF 2023-2024.]
2525 The Commonwealth of Massachusetts
2626 _______________
2727 In the One Hundred and Ninety-Fourth General Court
2828 (2025-2026)
2929 _______________
3030 An Act establishing memorial markers in the towns of Milton and Canton in memory of certain
3131 law enforcement officers killed in the line of duty.
3232 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Court assembled, and by the authority
3333 of the same, as follows:
3434 1 The department of conservation and recreation shall erect and maintain 4 suitable
3535 2markers in memory of 4 law enforcement officers who were killed in the line of duty. The
3636 3markers shall be similar in form to street signs, shall be placed on sidewalk land islands at the
3737 4locations near where each officer was killed, and shall each include the name of the officer and
3838 5the circumstances of their death, as follows:
3939 6 (i) to be placed on 158 Blue Hills Parkway, northbound, in the Town of Milton in
4040 7memory of Patrolman Robert Dana, noting “On March 25, 1984, while conducting a traffic stop
4141 8in the Town of Milton on Blue Hills Parkway, Patrolman Dana was shot and fatally wounded.”; 2 of 2
4242 9 (ii) to be placed on Blue Hills Parkway, northbound, at Parkway Crescent in the Town of
4343 10Milton in memory of Patrolman Robert Edmonds, noting “On December 23, 1936, while on
4444 11pursuit of a stolen vehicle on Blue Hills Parkway in the Town of Milton, Patrolman Edmonds
4545 12collided with a tree and subsequently succumbed to his injuries.”;
4646 13 (iii) to be placed on Hillside street at Chickatawbut road in the Town of Milton in
4747 14memory of Patrolman Robert Stewart, noting “On February 8, 1913, while on mounted patrol,
4848 15Patrolman Stewart was thrown from his horse on Hillside Street in the Town of Milton.
4949 16Patrolman Stewart subsequently succumbed to his injuries.”;
5050 17 (iv) to be placed near Fisherman’s Beach at Ponkapoag pond in the Town of Canton, in
5151 18memory of Patrolman William Mateer, noting “On January 10, 1909, while attempting to rescue
5252 19a fisherman who had fallen through the ice on Ponkapoag Pond in the Town of Canton, both
5353 20Patrolman Mateer and the fisherman drowned.”