Massachusetts 2025-2026 Regular Session

Massachusetts Senate Bill S866 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 1 of 1
22 SENATE DOCKET, NO. 1621 FILED ON: 1/16/2025
33 SENATE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 866
44 The Commonwealth of Massachusetts
55 _________________
66 PRESENTED BY:
77 Cindy F. Friedman
88 _________________
99 To the Honorable Senate and House of Representatives of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts in General
1010 Court assembled:
1111 The undersigned legislators and/or citizens respectfully petition for the adoption of the accompanying bill:
1212 An Act to protect medically fragile children.
1313 _______________
1414 PETITION OF:
1515 NAME:DISTRICT/ADDRESS :Cindy F. FriedmanFourth MiddlesexSean Garballey23rd Middlesex1/28/2025 1 of 4
1616 SENATE DOCKET, NO. 1621 FILED ON: 1/16/2025
1717 SENATE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 866
1818 By Ms. Friedman, a petition (accompanied by bill, Senate, No. 866) of Cindy F. Friedman and
1919 Sean Garballey for legislation to protect medically fragile children. Health Care Financing.
2020 [SIMILAR MATTER FILED IN PREVIOUS SESSION
2121 SEE SENATE, NO. 748 OF 2023-2024.]
2222 The Commonwealth of Massachusetts
2323 _______________
2424 In the One Hundred and Ninety-Fourth General Court
2525 (2025-2026)
2626 _______________
2727 An Act to protect medically fragile children.
2828 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Court assembled, and by the authority
2929 of the same, as follows:
3030 1 SECTION 1. Section 24 of Chapter 12C of the General Laws is hereby amended by
3131 2adding at the end of the first paragraph the following sentence:
3232 3 In developing the biennial report, the center shall seek input from nurses who provide
3333 4continuous skilled nursing care and patients and family members of patients that receive
3434 5continuous skilled nursing care and include in the report information about direct care
3535 6experiences.
3636 7 SECTION 2. Chapter 118E of the General Laws is hereby amended by adding the
3737 8following section:-
3838 9 Section 83. (a) Notwithstanding any general or special law to the contrary, and subject to
3939 10appropriation, the executive office of health and human services shall increase the budget for 2 of 4
4040 11continuous skilled nursing care, as defined in 101 CMR 361 and 130 CMR 403.402, by an
4141 12amount that ensures:
4242 13 (1) At least 75 percent of continuous skilled nursing hours authorized by MassHealth are
4343 14filled on or before July 1, 2025;
4444 15 (2) At least 80 percent of continuous skilled nursing hours authorized by MassHealth are
4545 16filled on or before July 1, 2026; and
4646 17 (3) At least 85 percent of continuous skilled nursing hours authorized by MassHealth are
4747 18filled on or before July 1, 2027, and shall remain at 85 percent or above thereafter.
4848 19 (b) The executive office of health and human services may require any portion of the
4949 20budget increases provided for in this section to be used exclusively to increase the wage payment
5050 21rate of nurses providing continuous skilled nursing care.
5151 22 (c) To satisfy the requirements in subsection (a), the executive office of health and human
5252 23services shall require MassHealth to submit an annual report no later than January 1 that:
5353 24 (1) demonstrates that MassHealth has not changed its authorization criteria for
5454 25continuous skilled nursing services in a way that is more restrictive and results in a reduction in
5555 26the amount of authorized hours that would have been authorized previously; and
5656 27 (2) includes the following information from the immediately preceding calendar year: (i)
5757 28the number of filled and unfilled continuous skilled nursing hours authorized by MassHealth; (ii)
5858 29the number of appeals received by MassHealth for the denial or modification of continuous
5959 30skilled nursing hours and the number of patients that filed an appeal; (iii) the number of patients
6060 31that received a reduction in the amount of authorized continuous skilled nursing hours; and (iv) 3 of 4
6161 32the number of authorized continuous skilled nursing hours reduced from the immediately
6262 33preceding calendar year, if any.
6363 34 (d) The executive office of health and human services, in collaboration with MassHealth
6464 35and after consultation with the Massachusetts Pediatric Nursing Care Campaign, shall
6565 36promulgate regulations to implement this section.
6666 37 (e) Nothing in this section shall be construed to prohibit filling 85 percent of the
6767 38continuous skilled nursing hours authorized by MassHealth prior to July 1, 2027.
6868 39 SECTION 3. Notwithstanding any general or special law to the contrary, the office of
6969 40Medicaid shall review the wage payment rates established by home health agencies that provide
7070 41continuous skilled nursing care, as defined in 101 CMR 361.00 and 130 CMR 403.402, for the
7171 42providers of those services. The office shall provide: (i) an aggregated overview of the wage
7272 43payment rates paid by home health agencies to staff or contracted nurses providing continuous
7373 44skilled nursing care, including any increases in said wage rates resulting from increases in
7474 45Medicaid rates paid to home health agencies for continuous skilled nursing care in state fiscal
7575 46years 2022, 2023 and 2024; (ii) an aggregated breakdown of said wage rates as applied to the
7676 47acuity level of patients receiving continuous skilled nursing care; (iii) an aggregated breakdown
7777 48of said wage rates as applied to the licensure level of the providers of continuous skilled nursing
7878 49care; and (iv) recommendations on criteria to be included in any future reporting by home health
7979 50agencies receiving an increase of continuous skilled nursing care rates provided by the office.
8080 51The office shall provide this report not later than March 1, 2027 to the clerks of the senate and
8181 52house of representatives, the joint committee on health care financing and the senate and house
8282 53committees on ways and means. Home health agencies providing continuous skilled nursing care 4 of 4
8383 54shall provide all information and documentation requested by the office of Medicaid to compile
8484 55the required report under this section.