House | 04/09/2022 | Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 45 | ||
House | 04/01/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/01/2022 | Third Reading Passed (94-39) | ||
House | 04/01/2022 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/01/2022 | Third Reading Passed (29-17) | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {983820/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Motion Laid Over (Senator Salling) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {983820/1 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 02/25/2022 | Third Reading Passed (96-34) | ||
House | 02/23/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 02/23/2022 | Floor Amendment {173321/1 (Delegate Rose) Rejected (38-94) | ||
House | 02/23/2022 | Floor Amendment {543728/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (38-94) | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | Motion Special Order until 2/23 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | Hearing 2/14 at 10:00 a.m. | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Judiciary | ||
House | 08/12/2021 | Pre-filed |