House | 05/16/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 350 | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (130-0) | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Third Readings Passed with Amendments (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Floor Amendment {943721/1 (Senator Hester) Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {713126/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred Finance Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (132-0) | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {293229/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | First Reading Appropriations and Health and Government Operations |