House | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 509 | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (93-37) | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Motion Special Order until 4/6 (Senator Watson) Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Committee Amendment Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {793322/1 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (98-32) | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {443229/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | First Reading Appropriations |