House | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 632 | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Third Reading Passed (128-0) | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | First Reading Judiciary |