House | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 511 | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (129-0) | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {133821/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/26/2022 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (132-0) | ||
House | 03/19/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {143526/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/19/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations) | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary |