House | 05/12/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 265 | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (112-2) | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Third Readings Passed with Amendments (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Floor Amendment {483529/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {203525/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/26/2022 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (130-1) | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {673423/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | Hearing 1/19 at 2:50 p.m. | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | Hearing 1/19 at 2:30 p.m. | ||
House | 10/07/2021 | Pre-filed |