House | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 654 | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (108-24) | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {263528/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/11/2022 | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |