House | 05/12/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 296 | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Third Reading Passed (35-12) | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (92-39) | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {693923/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 02/11/2022 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |