House | 05/16/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 433 | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Third Reading Passed (42-0) | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (132-0) | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m. | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Hearing 3/09 at 1:25 p.m. | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/11/2022 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |