House | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 663 | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (129-0) | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {323828/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/16/2022 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {533224/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/11/2022 | First Reading Ways and Means |