House | 05/16/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 412 | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Referred Rules | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Third Reading Passed (130-0) | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {753225/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/11/2022 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |