House
|
05/12/2022
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 243
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (115-4)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Conference Committee Report {563327/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Griffith, Zucker and Salling)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Senate Refuses Recede
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates P. Young, Rosenberg and Kipke)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
House Requests Senate Recede
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Floor Committee Amendment {803229/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {183627/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Referred Budget and Taxation
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (104-27)
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2022
|
Floor Amendment {513224/1 (Delegate Novotny) Rejected (34-90)
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2022
|
Floor Amendment {403125/1 (Delegate Novotny) Rejected (37-90)
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {303823/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Hearing 2/22 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
|
|
|