House | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 675 | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (127-1) | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {713325/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred Budget and Taxation Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Third Reading Passed (129-1) | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {813321/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 02/11/2022 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |