Senate | 04/11/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (129-1) | ||
House | 03/19/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/19/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {223622/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/19/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/11/2022 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |