House | 04/09/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 30 | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Third Reading Passed (42-5) | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (90-41) | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Floor Amendment {313326/1 (Delegate Long) Rejected (12-100) | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Mautz) Adopted | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {103622/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/11/2022 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |