Maryland 2022 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB1235 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/14/2022

                             
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
          *hb1235*  
  
HOUSE BILL 1235 
J1, F1   	2lr2945 
HB 1346/20 – W&M     
By: Delegates Hill, Foley, Henson, Prettyman, and Ruth 
Introduced and read first time: February 11, 2022 
Assigned to: Ways and Means 
 
A BILL ENTITLED 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Youth Sports Safety Advisory Commission 2 
 
FOR the purpose of establishing the Youth Sports Safety Advisory Commission to study 3 
and make recommendations to minimize risk and maximize safety for youth 4 
athletes; and generally relating to the Youth Sports Safety Advisory Commission. 5 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 6 
That: 7 
 
 (a) There is a Youth Sports Safety Advisory Commission. 8 
 
 (b) The Commission consists of the following members: 9 
 
 (1) one member of the Senate of Maryland, appointed by the President of 10 
the Senate; 11 
 
 (2) one member of the House of Delegates, appointed by the Speaker of the 12 
House; 13 
 
 (3) the State Superintendent of Schools, or the State Superintendent’s 14 
designee; 15 
 
 (4) the following members who have experience with youth sports safety or 16 
treating youth sports injuries, appointed by the Governor on or before February 19, 2023: 17 
 
 (i) one representative of the Maryland Chapter of the American 18 
Academy of Pediatrics; 19 
 
 (ii) one representative of the Maryland Academy of Family 20 
Physicians; 21 
  2 	HOUSE BILL 1235  
 
 
 (iii) one representative of the Society of Pediatric Psychology; 1 
 
 (iv) one representative of the Maryland Psychological Association; 2 
 
 (v) one representative of the American Academy of Clinical 3 
Neuropsychology; 4 
 
 (vi) one representative of the Maryland Athletic Trainers 5 
Association; 6 
 
 (vii) one representative of the Maryland Public Secondary Schools 7 
Athletic Association who is a coach; 8 
 
 (viii) one representative of the Maryland Board of Football Officials; 9 
 
 (ix) one representative of the Medical Mutual Liability Insurance 10 
Society of Maryland who is a risk management specialist; 11 
 
 (x) one pediatrician or family medicine practitioner; 12 
 
 (xi) one orthopedist; 13 
 
 (xii) one emergency medicine physician who treats pediatric patients; 14 
 
 (xiii) one pediatric cardiologist; 15 
 
 (xiv) one public health epidemiologist; and 16 
 
 (xv) one physical therapist. 17 
 
 (c) The Governor shall designate the chair of the Commission. 18 
 
 (d) The Maryland Department of Health shall provide staff for the Commission. 19 
 
 (e) A member of the Commission: 20 
 
 (1) may not receive compensation as a member of the Commission; but 21 
 
 (2) is entitled to reimbursement for expenses under the Standard State 22 
Travel Regulations as provided in the State budget. 23 
 
 (f) The Commission shall: 24 
 
 (1) study evidence–based policies and practices for maximizing safety for 25 
youth athletes at different age levels and stages of brain development based on national 26 
research; 27 
   	HOUSE BILL 1235 	3 
 
 
 (2) seek input from nationally recognized youth sports oversight 1 
organizations, including US Youth Soccer, USA Cheer, US Lacrosse, and USA Football; 2 
 
 (3) study ways to reduce injury risk levels to youth athletes at different 3 
ages; and 4 
 
 (4) make recommendations for implementation of evidence–based best 5 
practices for minimizing injury risk for youth athletes. 6 
 
 (g) On or before December 31, 2023, the Commission shall submit a report of its 7 
findings and recommendations to the Governor, the State Board of Education, the 8 
Maryland Department of Health, and, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State Government 9 
Article, the General Assembly. 10 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 11 
January 1, 2023. It shall remain effective for a period of 5 years and, at the end of December 12 
31, 2027, this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be 13 
abrogated and of no further force and effect. 14