House
|
04/21/2022
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 169
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (123-9)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Conference Committee Report {503021/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Washington, Patterson and Reilly)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Senate Refuses Recede
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Atterbeary, Attar and C. Branch)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
House Requests Senate Recede
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {373720/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (131-1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {653621/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
First Reading Ways and Means
|
|
|