House | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 655 | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (127-6) | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {273022/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Third Reading Passed (124-3) | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {593723/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/11/2022 | First Reading Economic Matters |