House | 04/09/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 32 | ||
House | 04/01/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/01/2022 | Third Reading Passed (133-0) | ||
House | 04/01/2022 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {333420/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (130-1) | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {163725/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 02/13/2022 | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/11/2022 | First Reading Appropriations |