Senate | 03/23/2022 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (128-3) | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {913820/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/11/2022 | First Reading Judiciary |