House
|
05/16/2022
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 473
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
House Concurs Senate Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {133326/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Hearing 3/09 at 1:25 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Hearing canceled
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
First Reading Environment and Transportation
|
|
|