Senate | 03/23/2022 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (133-0) | ||
House | 03/19/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/19/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {533328/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/19/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/11/2022 | First Reading Ways and Means |