House | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 531 | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Referred Rules | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Third Reading Passed (102-34) | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {693428/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Reassigned to Ways and Means Appropriations | ||
House | 02/11/2022 | First Reading Ways and Means |