EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. Underlining indicates amendments to bill. Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by amendment. *hb1349* HOUSE BILL 1349 F1 2lr3241 CF SB 831 By: Delegate Henson Delegates Henson, Atterbeary, C. Branch, Charles, Ebersole, Feldmark, Griffith, Ivey, D. Jones, Lisanti, Luedtke, Patterson, and Wilkins Introduced and read first time: February 11, 2022 Assigned to: Ways and Means Reassigned: Ways and Means and Appropriations, February 17, 2022 Committee Report: Favorable with amendments House action: Adopted Read second time: March 21, 2022 CHAPTER ______ AN ACT concerning 1 Education Support Professionals – Workgroup and Bonus Bonus and Report 2 FOR the purpose of establishing the Workgroup to Study the Wages of Education Support 3 Professionals; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an 4 appropriation sufficient to provide a certain bonus to certain public school employees 5 in a certain fiscal year; requiring the State Department of Education to collect 6 certain data from each county board of education for a certain school year and to 7 report the data on or before a certain date; and generally relating to the study of the 8 wages of, and the payment of a bonus to, education support professionals. 9 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 10 That: 11 (a) There is a Workgroup to Study the Wages of Education Support Professionals. 12 (b) The purpose of the Workgroup is to determine what percentage of education 13 support professionals in the State earn a living wage and to study increasing the wages of 14 education support professionals to attract and retain skilled workers. 15 (c) The Workgroup consists of the following members: 16 (1) two members of the Senate of Maryland, appointed by the President of 17 the Senate; 18 2 HOUSE BILL 1349 (2) two members of the House of Delegates, appointed by the Speaker of 1 the House; 2 (3) one member of the Maryland Association of Boards of Education, 3 appointed by the Executive Director of the Association; 4 (4) the President of the Maryland State Education Association, or the 5 President’s designee; 6 (5) the President of the Service Employees International Union Local 500, 7 or the President’s designee; 8 (6) the President of the American Federation of State, County and 9 Municipal Employees Local 2250, or the President’s designee; 10 (7) the President of the American Federation of Teachers–Maryland, or the 11 President’s designee; and 12 (8) the Executive Director of the American Federation of State, County and 13 Municipal Employees Council 67, or the Executive Director’s designee. 14 (d) The Workgroup shall elect the chair of the Workgroup by a majority vote at 15 the first meeting. 16 (e) The Maryland State Department of Education shall provide staff for the 17 Workgroup. 18 (f) A member of the Workgroup: 19 (1) may not receive compensation as a member of the Workgroup; but 20 (2) is entitled to reimbursement for expenses under the Standard State 21 Travel Regulations, as provided in the State budget. 22 (g) In determining what percentage of education support professionals earn a 23 living wage in the State and to study increasing the wages of education support 24 professionals to attract and retain skilled workers, the Workgroup shall consider: 25 (1) the role of local education systems and the State in hiring education 26 support professionals; 27 (2) the number of education support professionals employed by the State 28 or a local school system, or as a contractor; 29 (3) any cost–sharing between the State and the local school systems with 30 regard to the wages and salaries of education support professionals; 31 HOUSE BILL 1349 3 (4) the total number of part–time and full–time education support 1 professionals in the State; 2 (5) the number of hours required to work, according to the policies of each 3 jurisdiction, to be considered a full–time employee; 4 (6) a complete list of education support professional classifications by 5 jurisdiction; 6 (7) the average hourly wage of education support professionals in the State 7 and by jurisdiction; 8 (8) an analysis of the wage scale for education support professionals; 9 (9) information on increased wages or bonuses by jurisdiction within the 10 last 5 years; 11 (10) the amount of vacancies in the State and by jurisdiction for education 12 support professional jobs; and 13 (11) information on the future of education support professional jobs in the 14 State. 15 (h) (1) On or before November 30, 2022, the Workgroup shall submit an 16 interim report of its findings and recommendations to, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the 17 State Government Article, the Senate Budget and Taxation Committee, the Senate 18 Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee, the House Appropriations 19 Committee, and the House Committee on Ways and Means. 20 (2) On or before August 31, 2023, the Workgroup shall submit a final report 21 of its findings and recommendations, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State Government 22 Article, to the Senate Budget and Taxation Committee, the Senate Education, Health, and 23 Environmental Affairs Committee, the House Appropriations Committee, and the House 24 Committee on Ways and Means. 25 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That: 26 (a) If the fiscal year 2023 budget includes an appropriation sufficient to provide a 27 $500 bonus to each noncertificated education support professional in fiscal year 2023, the 28 In this section, “noncertificated education support professionals” means noncertificated 29 public school employees designated as part of a bargaining unit under Title 6, Subtitle 5 of 30 the Education Article. 31 (b) The Governor shall include in the annual budget bill for fiscal year 2024 an 32 appropriation sufficient equal to the number of noncertificated education support 33 professionals, collected in accordance with subsection (c) of this section, multiplied by $500, 34 4 HOUSE BILL 1349 in order to provide a $500 bonus to each noncertificated education support professional in 1 fiscal year 2024. 2 (b) If the fiscal year 2023 budget does not include an appropriation sufficient to 3 provide a $500 bonus to each noncertificated education support professional in fiscal year 4 2023, the Governor shall include in the annual budget bill for fiscal year 2024 an 5 appropriation sufficient to provide a $1,000 bonus to each noncertificated education support 6 professional in fiscal year 2024. 7 (c) The State Department of Education shall: 8 (1) collect data from each county board of education, including Baltimore 9 City, on the number of noncertificated education support professionals the county board 10 employed during the 2021–2022 school year; and 11 (2) on or before September 15, 2022, submit a report to the Governor, the 12 Department of Budget and Management, and the General Assembly, in accordance with § 13 2–1257 of the State Government Article, on the total number of noncertificated education 14 support professionals employed by county boards of education during the 2021–2022 school 15 year. 16 SECTION 3. 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 17 July 1, 2022. Section 1 of this this Act shall remain effective for a period of 1 year and 4 18 months and, at the end of October 31, 2023, Section 1 of this Act, with no further action 19 required by the General Assembly, shall be abrogated and of no further force and effect. 20 Approved: ________________________________________________________________________________ Governor. ________________________________________________________________________________ Speaker of the House of Delegates. ________________________________________________________________________________ President of the Senate.