Senate | 04/04/2022 | Referred Rules | ||
House | 04/04/2022 | Third Reading Passed (120-1) | ||
House | 04/01/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/01/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {813628/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m. | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 02/11/2022 | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/11/2022 | First Reading Ways and Means |