House | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 733 | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Third Reading Passed (32-14) | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2022 | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | Third Reading Passed (101-33) | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {803124/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/17/2022 | Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Ways and Means | ||
House | 08/26/2021 | Pre-filed |