House | 05/27/2022 | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Third Reading Passed (32-15) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (97-33) | ||
House | 03/19/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/19/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {253829/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/19/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 01/10/2022 | Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 11/01/2021 | Pre-filed |