Maryland 2022 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB1424 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/17/2022

                             
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
          *hb1424*  
  
HOUSE BILL 1424 
C8   	2lr3256 
    	CF SB 782 
By: Delegate R. Lewis 
Introduced and read first time: February 17, 2022 
Assigned to: Rules and Executive Nominations 
 
A BILL ENTITLED 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Workgroup on the Post–COVID–19 Crisis Economic Transition 2 
 
FOR the purpose of establishing the Workgroup on the Post–COVID–19 Crisis Economic 3 
Transition; and generally relating to the COVID–19 economic crisis.  4 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 5 
That: 6 
 
 (a) There is a Workgroup on the Post–COVID–19 Crisis Economic Transition. 7 
 
 (b) The Workgroup consists of the following members: 8 
 
 (1) four members of the Senate of Maryland, including members from the 9 
Budget and Taxation Committee, the Finance Committee, and the Education, Health, and 10 
Environmental Affairs Committee, appointed by the President of the Senate; 11 
 
 (2)  four members of the House of Delegates, including members from the 12 
Appropriations Committee, the Committee on Ways and Means, the Economic Matters 13 
Committee, the Health and Government Operations Committee, and the Environment and 14 
Transportation Committee, appointed by the Speaker of the House; 15 
 
 (3) five members of the business sector, including representatives from the 16 
health care industry, cybersecurity industry, restaurant industry, childcare industry, and 17 
a multi–industry organization appointed by the Governor; 18 
 
 (4) one member of the State nonprofit sector appointed by the Governor; 19 
 
 (5) the Secretary of Commerce, or the Secretary’s designee; 20 
 
 (6) the Secretary of Labor, or the Secretary’s designee; 21 
  2 	HOUSE BILL 1424  
 
 
 (7) the Secretary of Transportation, or the Secretary’s designee; and 1 
 
 (8) the Secretary of Housing and Community Development, or the 2 
Secretary’s designee. 3 
 
 (c) The President of the Senate and the Speaker of the House shall each appoint 4 
one of their members as cochair of the Workgroup. 5 
 
 (d) The Department of Legislative Services shall provide staff for the Workgroup. 6 
 
 (e) The Workgroup: 7 
 
 (1) may retain the services of the University of Maryland; and 8 
 
 (2) shall be appropriated $500,000 for that purpose. 9 
 
 (f) A member of the Workgroup: 10 
 
 (1) may not receive compensation as a member of the Workgroup; but 11 
 
 (2) is entitled to reimbursement for expenses under the Standard State 12 
Travel Regulations, as provided in the State budget. 13 
 
 (g) The Workgroup shall make recommendations regarding how the State may 14 
adjust its economic development and other strategies in the context of changes resulting 15 
from crises in sectors including: 16 
 
 (1) telehealth; 17 
 
 (2) telework; 18 
 
 (3) online education, from kindergarten to graduate programs; 19 
 
 (4) childcare; 20 
 
 (5) job creation acceleration; 21 
 
 (6) unemployment compensation; 22 
 
 (7) underemployment; 23 
 
 (8) small businesses and entrepreneurship; 24 
 
 (9) tax system modernization; 25 
 
 (10) changes in real estate such as office space, retail, residential, rental and 26 
ownership, and community economic centers; 27   	HOUSE BILL 1424 	3 
 
 
 
 (11) supply chain management; 1 
 
 (12) small businesses that are not associated with a chain store, commonly 2 
referred to as “main street businesses”; 3 
 
 (13) rebuilding the public health system; and 4 
 
 (14) other impacts on public services. 5 
 
 (h) On or before December 1, 2022, the Workgroup shall submit an interim report 6 
of its findings and recommendations to the Governor and, in accordance with § 7 
2–1257 of the State Government Article, the General Assembly. 8 
 
 (i) On or before December 1, 2023, the Workgroup shall submit a final report of 9 
its findings and recommendations to the Governor and, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the 10 
State Government Article, the General Assembly. 11 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 12 
1, 2022. It shall remain effective for a period of 2 years and, at the end of June 30, 2024, 13 
this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be abrogated and 14 
of no further force and effect. 15