Senate | 04/11/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Referred Rules | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Hearing 4/05 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |