House | 05/16/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 381 | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Referred Rules | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 03/04/2022 | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Rereferred to Judiciary | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |