House
|
05/16/2022
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (125-7)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
House Concurs Senate Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (41-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2022
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {913626/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (127-3)
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
Favorable Report by Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Rereferred to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
|
|
|