House
|
04/21/2022
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (128-0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
House Concurs Senate Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {543923/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2022
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {153029/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
Hearing 3/16 at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
Hearing canceled
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2022
|
Hearing 3/16 at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2022
|
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2022
|
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
|
|
|