1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. |
---|
4 | 4 | | [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. |
---|
5 | 5 | | *hb1472* |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | HOUSE BILL 1472 |
---|
8 | 8 | | Q3 2lr3085 |
---|
9 | 9 | | CF SB 122 |
---|
10 | 10 | | By: Delegate Patterson |
---|
11 | 11 | | Introduced and read first time: February 27, 2022 |
---|
12 | 12 | | Assigned to: Rules and Executive Nominations |
---|
13 | 13 | | |
---|
14 | 14 | | A BILL ENTITLED |
---|
15 | 15 | | |
---|
16 | 16 | | AN ACT concerning 1 |
---|
17 | 17 | | |
---|
18 | 18 | | Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and 2 |
---|
19 | 19 | | Emergency Medical Services 3 |
---|
20 | 20 | | |
---|
21 | 21 | | FOR the purpose of increasing the amount of a subtraction modification under the 4 |
---|
22 | 22 | | Maryland income tax for certain qualifying volunteer fire, rescue, and emergency 5 |
---|
23 | 23 | | medical services members beginning in a certain taxable year; and generally relating 6 |
---|
24 | 24 | | to a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for qualifying volunteer 7 |
---|
25 | 25 | | fire, rescue, and emergency medical services members. 8 |
---|
26 | 26 | | |
---|
27 | 27 | | BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 9 |
---|
28 | 28 | | Article – Tax – General 10 |
---|
29 | 29 | | Section 10–208(a) and (i–1)(1) 11 |
---|
30 | 30 | | Annotated Code of Maryland 12 |
---|
31 | 31 | | (2016 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 13 |
---|
32 | 32 | | |
---|
33 | 33 | | BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 14 |
---|
34 | 34 | | Article – Tax – General 15 |
---|
35 | 35 | | Section 10–208(i–1)(3) 16 |
---|
36 | 36 | | Annotated Code of Maryland 17 |
---|
37 | 37 | | (2016 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 18 |
---|
38 | 38 | | |
---|
39 | 39 | | SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 19 |
---|
40 | 40 | | That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 20 |
---|
41 | 41 | | |
---|
42 | 42 | | Article – Tax – General 21 |
---|
43 | 43 | | |
---|
44 | 44 | | 10–208. 22 |
---|
45 | 45 | | |
---|
46 | 46 | | (a) In addition to the modification under § 10–207 of this, the amounts under this 23 |
---|
47 | 47 | | section are subtracted from the federal adjusted gross income of a resident to determine 24 |
---|
48 | 48 | | Maryland adjusted gross income. 25 2 HOUSE BILL 1472 |
---|
49 | 49 | | |
---|
50 | 50 | | |
---|
51 | 51 | | |
---|
52 | 52 | | (i–1) (1) The subtraction under subsection (a) of this section includes an amount 1 |
---|
53 | 53 | | equal to the amount specified in paragraph (3) of this subsection if an individual is a 2 |
---|
54 | 54 | | qualifying volunteer fire, rescue, or emergency medical services member for the taxable 3 |
---|
55 | 55 | | year, as determined under paragraph (2) of this subsection. 4 |
---|
56 | 56 | | |
---|
57 | 57 | | (3) The amount of the subtraction under paragraph (1) of this subsection is 5 |
---|
58 | 58 | | equal to: 6 |
---|
59 | 59 | | |
---|
60 | 60 | | (i) $4,750 for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2017, but 7 |
---|
61 | 61 | | before January 1, 2019; 8 |
---|
62 | 62 | | |
---|
63 | 63 | | (ii) $5,000 for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2018, but 9 |
---|
64 | 64 | | before January 1, 2020; 10 |
---|
65 | 65 | | |
---|
66 | 66 | | (iii) $6,000 for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2019, but 11 |
---|
67 | 67 | | before January 1, 2021; 12 |
---|
68 | 68 | | |
---|
69 | 69 | | (iv) $6,500 for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2020, but 13 |
---|
70 | 70 | | before January 1, 2022; [and] 14 |
---|
71 | 71 | | |
---|
72 | 72 | | (v) $7,000 for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2021, 15 |
---|
73 | 73 | | BUT BEFORE JANUARY 1, 2023; AND 16 |
---|
74 | 74 | | |
---|
75 | 75 | | (VI) $10,000 FOR A TAXABLE YEAR B EGINNING AFTER 17 |
---|
76 | 76 | | DECEMBER 31, 2022. 18 |
---|
77 | 77 | | |
---|
78 | 78 | | SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 19 |
---|
79 | 79 | | 1, 2022. 20 |
---|
80 | 80 | | |
---|