House | 04/21/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 181 | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Third Reading Passed (118-15) | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {883326/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 02/25/2022 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | Third Reading Passed (122-10) | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {903122/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 01/06/2022 | Hearing 1/13 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 09/09/2021 | Pre-filed |