House | 05/16/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 387 | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {123125/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (130-0) | ||
House | 03/19/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {843929/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/19/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 01/21/2022 | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 10/27/2021 | Pre-filed |