House | 04/21/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178 | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Third Reading Passed (34-12) | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Third Reading Passed (112-25) | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {413526/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 01/10/2022 | Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 09/30/2021 | Pre-filed |