Senate | 03/14/2022 | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
House | 03/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (128-4) | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Motion Special Order until 3/9 (Delegate Cox) Adopted | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Floor Amendment {443728/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (40-87) | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {363928/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/13/2022 | First Reading Ways and Means |