House | 04/12/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 64 | ||
House | 04/01/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Third Reading Passed (130-0) | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {953725/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 01/25/2022 | Hearing 2/01 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 01/25/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 01/18/2022 | Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m. | ||
House | 01/13/2022 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |