House | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 680 | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2022 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | Third Reading Passed (121-0) | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {753525/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 01/25/2022 | Hearing 2/03 at 2:30 p.m. | ||
House | 01/13/2022 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |