House | 04/12/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 110 | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (103-26) | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {113024/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/13/2022 | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/13/2022 | First Reading Ways and Means |