Senate | 03/04/2022 | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Third Reading Passed (133-0) | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {513020/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/28/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 01/13/2022 | Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m. | ||
House | 01/13/2022 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |