Senate | 03/14/2022 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (96-39) | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/13/2022 | First Reading Economic Matters |