Senate | 03/31/2022 | Referred Rules | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Third Reading Passed (91-41) | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Floor Amendment {723020/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (44-90) | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Floor Amendment {913328/1 (Delegate Griffith) Rejected (44-90) | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Griffith) Adopted | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {193124/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/14/2022 | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/13/2022 | First Reading Judiciary |