House
|
05/16/2022
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 449
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Conference Committee Report {703028/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2022
|
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators McCray, Guzzone and Eckardt)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2022
|
Senate Refuses Recede
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2022
|
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Luedtke, Feldmark and Long)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2022
|
House Requests Senate Recede
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2022
|
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {913025/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Referred Budget and Taxation
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (123-6)
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {423029/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
First Reading Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
01/07/2022
|
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
06/25/2021
|
Pre-filed
|
|
|