House | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 487 | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Third Reading Passed (123-12) | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Third Reading Passed (34-13) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {543020/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Third Reading Passed (122-13) | ||
House | 03/16/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {363223/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/13/2022 | First Reading Economic Matters |