House | 04/21/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 138 | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (114-0) | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Third Readings Passed with Amendments (44-0) | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Floor Amendment {553920/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {433022/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {403124/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 01/28/2022 | Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 01/17/2022 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |